Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/28/2022 1:48:36 PM
Friday, January 28, 2022
Friday, January 28, 2022
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee
Change made: January 28, 2022 11:59 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 7, 2022 1:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Accountability and Implemenation Board
REMOVED: 9:05 AM
ADDED: 10:36 AM
REMOVED: 11:58 AM
ADDED: 11:59 AM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 28, 2022 12:39 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2022 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0528
Sen Pinsky, et al

Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
ADDED: 12:39 PM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 28, 2022 8:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0493
Sen Pinsky, et al

Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
ADDED: 8:26 AM

Change made: January 28, 2022 11:28 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0322
Sen Kagan, et al

Gas Price Gouging Act
ADDED: 11:28 AM

Change made: January 28, 2022 11:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2022 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0292
Sen Augustine

Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
SB0294
Sen Cassilly, et al

Health - Automated External Defibrillator, First Aid, and CPR - Requirements for Health Clubs
SB0380
Sen Benson, et al

Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program - Nurse Practitioners
SB0394
The Pres (Admin), et al

Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
SB0420
Sen Rosapepe, et al

Employment of Minors – Work Permits – Information Sharing
SB0421
Sen Rosapepe, et al

Primary and Secondary Schools – Bus Driver Wages – Study

House
Education Subcommittee
Change made: January 28, 2022 12:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
February 2, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0023
Del Washington

School Discipline - Data Collection and School Resource Officers
HB0084
Del Ruth, et al

Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
HB0118
Del Washington

Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
HB0139
Del Luedtke

State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
HB0194
Del Shetty

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 28, 2022 10:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0006
Del Cullison

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
HB0080
Del Cullison

Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
HB0245
Del Reznik, et al

Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
HB0275
Del Love, et al

Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
HB0353
Del Landis

Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
HB0430
Del Kerr

Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
HB0534
Del Bhandari, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring

Change made: January 28, 2022 10:14 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0450
Del Smith

Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
ADDED: 10:14 AM
HB0451
Del Stein

State Finance and Procurement – Grants – Prompt Payment Requirement
ADDED: 10:14 AM

Change made: January 28, 2022 10:14 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 15, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0479
Del Fennell, et al

General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
ADDED: 10:14 AM
HB0484
Del Bhandari, et al

General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
ADDED: 10:14 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 28, 2022 9:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0201
Del Kelly, et al

Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
REMOVED: 9:55 AM

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: January 28, 2022 10:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
February 4, 2022 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Guest-Anne Arundel Board of Education
Legislative Bond Initiatives
Vote HB95

Howard
Change made: January 28, 2022 10:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 2, 2022 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation and Howard County Senators meeting to discuss proposed local legislation.

Click to return on the top page