Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Afzali, Arentz, Beitzel, Carey, Chang, Clark, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Malone, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, Metzgar, Morhaim, Reilly, Saab, Simonaire, Sophocleus, West, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning November 1, 2017, a behavioral health program or specified health professional, when referring an individual to receive services at a recovery residence, to provide the individual with a list of certified recovery residences operating in the State and information on where specified services may be obtained; and requiring, on or before November 1, 2017, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to publish a specified list on its Web site.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326489/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {326489/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Text - Chapter - Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
(   19-2503, 7.5-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page