Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Lierman, Moon, and Sanchez
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award to a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified actions seeking to remedy a violation of a Maryland constitutional right; authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and expenses to a prevailing defendant under specified circumstances; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0393 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {463823/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (51-86)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {933729/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (49-88)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {463823/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (51-86) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {933729/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (49-88) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-47) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page