Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/18/2022 9:43:50 AM
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/7/2022 4:39 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Kramer

Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Sen Kramer

Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sen Kramer

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sen Klausmeier

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Sen Beidle

Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sen Jackson

Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund – Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
Sen Jackson

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sen Bailey

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve
Chr B&T (Dept)

Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion
Chr B&T (Dept)

Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations and Extension
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Application Filing Deadline – Extension
(Removed - 1/10/2022 4:50 PM)

Created: 1/11/2022 4:07 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Maryland Department of the Environment and Environmental Enforcement

Created: 1/11/2022 4:07 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Chr EHE (Dept)

Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds
Chr EHE (Dept)

Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration
Chr EHE (Dept)

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension

Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)

Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report
Sens Eckardt and Carozza

Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee

Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Eckardt

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sen Young

Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts
Sen Young

Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sen Kramer

Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee
Sen Reilly

Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 648 (Baltimore-Annapolis Boulevard)
Sen Reilly

Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Patuxent Road
Sen Ellis

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island
Sen Waldstreicher

Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
Sen Waldstreicher

Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
Sen Cassilly

Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Sherry's and Christopher's Law)
Sen Young

Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation
(Removed - 1/12/2022 3:12 PM)

Created: 1/12/2022 7:32 PM
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint Hearing with House Rules and Executive Nominations - HJ 1 and HJ 2
The Pres (Legislative Redistricting Advis

Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
The Pres (Admin)

Maryland Citizens' Legislative Districting Plan of 2022

Created: 1/13/2022 7:14 PM
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Voting Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The voting session will be held immediately after the bill hearing.
The Pres (Legislative Redistricting Advis

Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
The Pres (Admin)

Maryland Citizens' Legislative Districting Plan of 2022

House
Created: 1/5/2022 2:15 PM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Lopez

Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR only (Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Judiciary)
Del Hill

Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR only
Del Griffith

Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Del Solomon

Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR only
Del Henson

State Personnel Management System - Office of the Public Defender - Placement and Collective Bargaining
Oral testimony will be SPONSOR only

Created: 1/10/2022 11:18 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Holmes

Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Del Lisanti

Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Del Amprey

Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
Del Stewart

Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Del Stewart

Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Del Rosenberg

Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Del Hill

Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Sealing of Court Records
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Judiciary)
Del Lehman

Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Registration and License Information

Created: 1/7/2022 5:17 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Office of Legislative Audits: Review of Certain Emergency Procurements Related to the State of Maryland’s COVID-19 Response

Created: 1/10/2022 2:43 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HB0082 has been withdrawn via Sponsor
Del Hill

Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Appropriations)
Del Crosby

General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Del Carr

Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
Del Carr

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
(Added - 1/12/2022 9:40 AM)
Del Bagnall

Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Del Holmes

State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees
(Removed - 1/14/2022 12:23 PM)

Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Rent Court and Summary Ejectment Overview

Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Crosby

Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Dels Cardin and Atterbeary

Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity

Created: 1/13/2022 3:31 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Report of the Access to Counsel in Evictions from the Maryland Attorney General's Office and the Access to Counsel in Evictions Task Force

Created: 1/4/2022 3:57 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Johnson

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
(Added - 1/5/2022 3:24 PM)
Del Luedtke

Income Tax – Determination of Taxable Income – Union Dues and Expenses to Influence Collective Bargaining
Del Crosby

Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
(Removed - 1/7/2022 3:25 PM)

Created: 12/21/2021 7:54 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit and Tax Sales

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page