Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Anderton, Folden, S. Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Morgan, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from one-third to one-half the maximum portion of a home improvement contract price that a person may receive as a deposit before or at the time of execution of the home improvement contract.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1058 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page