Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education – Financial Aid Reductions – Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public senior and private nonprofit higher education institutions, within 30 days of a student's acceptance and before reducing a student's institutional gift aid, to provide certain students with notice of whether additional gift aid may result in a reduction of institutional gift aid and how much additional gift aid the student may accept before the institutional gift aid will be reduced; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education – Financial Aid Reductions – Notice
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   15-121, 18-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page