Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Platt, Miele, Anderton, Barron, Cullison, Gilchrist, Hayes, Jacobs, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McCray, McDonough, Metzgar, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, Sydnor, Vallario, A. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a notary public to perform notarial acts electronically; requiring a specified notary public to register with the Secretary of State before performing specified electronic notarizations; requiring the Secretary to develop a specified registration form for an electronic notary; requiring an electronic notary to reregister with the Secretary under specified circumstances; specifying requirements for electronic notarizations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0747
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-102, 3-104 )
(   18-101, 18-201 through 18-208, 19-103, 19-109, 19-110, 19-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page