Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Restorative Justice Program within the Victim Services Unit of the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; and establishing the position of Restorative Justice Legal Specialist, the Restorative Justice Program Revolving Fund, and the Maryland Restorative Justice Council.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0850
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-1201 through 11-1206, 11-502, 11-914   )
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 4:48 PM
Click to return on the top page