Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Henson, and Proctor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program in Frederick County; defining "assisted outpatient treatment" as a specific regimen of outpatient treatment for a mental health disorder to which an individual is ordered by the court to adhere.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0807
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Frederick County – Mental Health Law – Assisted Outpatient Treatment Pilot Program
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 4:29 PM
Click to return on the top page