Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Angel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person authorized to sell residential property subject to foreclosure to file a notice of foreclosure with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under specified circumstances; establishing that a notice of foreclosure may be filed through the Foreclosed Property Registry; requiring that the notice of foreclosure contain specified information; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0875
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {910311/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {910311/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {188074/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text - Chapter - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
(   14-126.1, 14-126.2, 14-126.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page