Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Collection and Use (Maryland Toll Rate Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to transfer $75,000,000 annually, beginning July 1, 2025, to the Transportation Trust Fund and to continue to make the transfer until the Authority has transferred total cumulative payments in the amount of $750,000,000; increasing a certain Authority revenue bond cap from $3,000,000,000 to $3,750,000,000; and authorizing the Authority to offer toll discounts to daily commuters and Maryland E-ZPass account holders under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1093
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-42)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Collection and Use (Maryland Toll Rate Reform Act of 2024)
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {833525/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Collection and Use (Maryland Toll Rate Reform Act of 2024)
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (91-42) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2024 3/26/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page