Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Frederick County Public School System’s Elementary School Social–Emotional Learning Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Pippy and Cox
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Frederick County Public School System's Elementary School Social-Emotional Learning Pilot Program to study the implementation of the program in the County's elementary schools and make recommendations on actions necessary to expand the program to middle schools and high schools; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on creating a comprehensive program to the Frederick County Public School Superintendent and Board of Education by December 31, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {715969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education - Graduation Requirements - Mental Health Education
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {715969/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Frederick County Public School System’s Elementary School Social–Emotional Learning Pilot Program
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study the Frederick County Public School System’s Elementary School Social–Emotional Learning Pilot Program
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page