Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Niarchos Parkway Film Center
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Anderson, Branch, Glenn, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Producer's Club of Maryland, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Niarchos Parkway film Center, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page