Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Arikan, Boteler, Chisholm, Hornberger, Kittleman, McComas, Szeliga, and Thiam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that it is unlawful for a parent or guardian of a student in a public school to fail to seek and participate in counseling with their child after receiving notice of violent and disruptive behavior; and requiring a public school principal to provide written notice to the parent or guardian of a student who engages in two or more number of incidents of violent and disruptive behavior in a public school during the school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1468 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act)
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
(   7-304.2 )
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page