Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Miele, Morgan, Platt, Rosenberg, Szeliga, West, K. Young, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to allow and apply a prorated daily copayment or coinsurance amount for a partial supply of a prescription drug dispensed by an in-network pharmacy under specified circumstances; prohibiting a specified insurer, nonprofit health service plan, and health maintenance organization from denying payment of benefits to an in-network pharmacy for a covered prescription drug solely on a specified basis; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0898
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {526685/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 9:30 PM (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {526685/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 9:30 PM (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Synchronization
(   15-850 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page