Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Boteler, Chisholm, M. Fisher, Kipke, Krebs, and McKay
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that multiple thefts committed by the same person in multiple counties under one scheme or continuing course of conduct may be joined and prosecuted in a certain county; providing that certain misdemeanor charges may not be aggregated to constitute a felony; and establishing requirements for a court to make a finding as to whether a theft meets a definition of organized retail theft for purposes of reporting to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0619
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0446 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Organized Retail Theft
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Organized Retail Theft
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 4:49 PM
Click to return on the top page