Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Ebersole, Washington, Walker, Mosby, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, Feldmark, Wilkins, and Patterson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State Tax Sale Ombudsman in the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to withhold from tax sale a dwelling owned by a homeowner who meets certain criteria; requiring certain notices sent to property owners whose properties are subject to tax sale to include a certain summary of the tax sale process and certain information concerning the State Tax Sale Ombudsman; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625762/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected (38-90)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (44-89)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-35)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {625762/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Cardin) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Floor Amendment {633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected (38-90) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Floor Amendment {923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (44-89) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-35) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {349530/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (110-27) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
(   1-101, 14-811, 14-812, 14-817.1, 14-873, 14-874, 2-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page