Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Anderson, Barron, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Haynes, Jalisi, Kelly, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lopez, Love, McComas, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; authorizing the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to hire, as provided in the State budget, certain individuals for the Technical Assistance Center; requiring and authorizing the Technical Assistance Center to take certain actions; establishing the Collaborative Planning and Implementation Committee for the Technical Assistance Center; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {162211/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {162211/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page