Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is Reversed
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Ali, Conaway, Gibson, Hayes, J. Lewis, Moon, Sanchez, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined; requiring certain compensation made by the Board to be in an amount equal to the greater of $50,000 for each year that the individual was in custody or the actual damages sustained by the individual including certain amounts; requiring the Board of Public Works to use certain money to provide the compensation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0987
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412314/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-17)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Reassigned to Judiciary Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {412314/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is Reversed
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (120-17) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation 48CClick to view Recorded Media
(   10-501, 10-502, 10-503, 10-504 )
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page