Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Contracts - Certification of Pay Equity Compliance - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, D.E. Davis, and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain employers to have a certificate of pay equity compliance issued by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; requiring a custodian of public records to deny the inspection of the part of a public record that contains certain data related to equal pay certificates; prohibiting certain units from entering into a certain contract unless a certain employer has a certain certificate; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Contracts - Certification of Pay Equity Compliance - Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Contracts - Certification of Pay Equity Compliance - Requirement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Reassigned to Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   17-801 through 17-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page