Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Barkley, Brooks, Impallaria, Kramer, J. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Wilson, and Glenn
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees on a public work contract to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and the amounts received by the employees; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173390/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {363225/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-85)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {843826/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (48-87)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {323426/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-86)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {173390/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {363225/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-85) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {843826/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (48-87) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {323426/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-86) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Finance 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page