Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring certain findings related to Health Enterprise Zones; requiring the Governor to include $68,000,000 in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2023 for waiting list services for individuals with developmental disabilities; requiring the Secretary of Health to designate contiguous geographic areas with documented health disparities and poor health outcomes as Health Enterprise Zones; authorizing certain entities to apply on behalf of certain areas for designation as Health Enterprise Zones; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2021 3/14/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   20-1401 through 20-1407, 7-205 )
(   10-731, 11-104, 2-1303 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page