Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a community solar energy generating system be located in the same electric service territory as a subscriber for the subscriber to receive monthly electric bill credits; requiring the Public Service Commission to require an electric company to file a revised tariff and protocol related to the application of bill credits by November 1, 2022; and requiring the Commission by January 31, 2023 to approve or amend and approve the required tariffs and protocols.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0733
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page