Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/27/2024 7:16:11 PM
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 11:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
February 28, 2024 3:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 27, 2024 1:24 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB1070
Sen McKay

Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
REMOVED: 11:23 AM
SB0715
Sen Kramer, et al

State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts – Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
REMOVED: 1:24 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 4:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0912
Sen McKay

Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
REMOVED: 4:22 PM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 8:44 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2024 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:45 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Governor's Office of Children

Change made: February 27, 2024 8:45 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 12:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0352
The Spkr (Admin)

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
HB0694
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
HB0741
Dels Phillips and White Holland

Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
HB0846
The Spkr (State Treasurer)

State Investment Portfolio - Investment Standards
HB0904
Del Hinebaugh

Community Colleges - Capital Projects - State Share Adjustment
HB0909
Del Hinebaugh

Education – Local Share of Major Education Aid – Nonrecurring Costs Exclusion
HB0949
Del Vogel

State Employees - Cancer Screening Leave
HB1009
Del Chang

Public Health – Federally Qualified Health Centers Grant Program – Recovery of Funding
HB0900
Del Solomon, et al

Employment Standards - Firefighters - Payment of Overtime and Payroll Information
HB0901
Del Wolek, et al

Higher Education - Part-Time Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Alterations
HB0902
Del Ghrist, et al

Prekindergarten - Ulysses Currie Head Start Program - Eligibility for State Funds
HB1150
The Spkr (State Treasurer)

Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
HB1439
Del Shetty, et al

Public Health - Funding for Trauma Centers and Services
HB0389
Del Healey, et al

State Highways - Sidewalks and Bicycle Pathways - Maintenance and Repair
HB1119
Del Rosenberg

Algorithmic Addiction Fund - Establishment
HB1398
Del Chang, et al

Higher Education – Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Eligibility
HB1451
Del Embry

Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established

Business Regulation Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 11:48 AM - HEARING ADDED
Business Regulation Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 10:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 10:56 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB1135
Del Wells

Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
REMOVED: 10:56 AM

Change made: February 27, 2024 4:43 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB1365
Dels Valderrama and Boafo

State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts - Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
REMOVED: 4:43 PM

Education Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 4:34 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
February 28, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 2:30 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0163
Del Charkoudian

Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
REMOVED: 2:30 PM

Change made: February 27, 2024 11:21 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1213
Del Pasteur

Baltimore County – Sheriff – Salary
ADDED: 11:21 AM
HB1300
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Restriction on Use of Real Property - Limitation MC 8-24
ADDED: 11:21 AM
HB1338
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Agricultural Preservation Advisory Board - Term Length - Alteration Ho. Co. 15-24
ADDED: 11:21 AM

Family Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 2:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0405
Del Kaufman, et al

Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
HB0406
Del Simpson, et al

Marriage – Confidential Communication – Criminal Charge
HB0745
Del Shetty, et al

Family Law - Protective Orders - Crimes of Violence and Stalking

Change made: February 27, 2024 2:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0214
Dels Boyce and Grammer

Family Law – Adoption of an Adult
HB0508
Del Embry

Children - Labor Trafficking
HB0542
Del Vogel, et al

Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 12:21 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB84, HB149, HB328, HB566, HB581, HB598, HB673, HB723, HB809, HB1002
REMOVED: 12:21 PM
HB84, HB149, HB328, HB566, HB581, HB673, HB723, HB809, HB1002
ADDED: 12:21 PM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 9:39 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1173
Del Qi

Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations
ADDED: 9:39 AM

Change made: February 27, 2024 9:38 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 13, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1173
Del Qi

Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations
REMOVED: 9:38 AM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 6:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB499, HB757, HB759, HB806, HB874, HB938, HB1103
REMOVED: 6:19 PM
HB499, HB757, HB759, HB874, HB938, HB1103
ADDED: 6:19 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 9:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 5:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
The committee will vote on amendments to HB814.

Public Safety Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2024 11:11 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Safety Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0583
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 27, 2024 12:55 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB1246
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Income Tax Credit for Parent and Guardian Volunteers in Elementary and Secondary Schools PG 411-24
REMOVED: 12:55 PM

Other
Baltimore County
Change made: February 27, 2024 1:21 PM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Other
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearings - None
Briefing - Comptroller Brooke Lierman
Bill Voting - None

No. 6 - Montgomery County
Change made: February 27, 2024 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 6 - Montgomery County - Other
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page