Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Access to High-Quality Early Childhood Education and Child Care for Children Three Years Old and Younger
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Bagnall, Cullison, Foley, Forbes, Grossman, D. Jones, Lehman, Lopez, McCaskill, Mireku-North, Patterson, Queen, Ruth, Simpson, Taylor, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Access to High-Quality Early Childhood Education and Child Care for Children Three Years Old and Younger to study implementing universal access to high-quality early childhood education and child care for children 3 years old and younger; and requiring the Commission, on or before October 1, 2025, to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Commission on Access to High-Quality Early Childhood Education and Child Care for Children Three Years Old and Younger
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page