Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, B. Barnes, Charles, D.E. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Healey, Ivey, Jackson, Jones, Korman, Proctor, Turner, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program to provide strategic investment in local housing and businesses to encourage sustainable communities and to focus on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable neighborhood revitalization effect; establishing the type of project eligible to receive funds; authorizing certain government agencies, including housing authorities, and certain community development organizations to apply to receive Program funds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {593224/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {593022/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {183422/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {924264/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {924031/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {593224/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {593022/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {183422/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Text - Chapter - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
(   4-510, 6-701 through 6-709, 6-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page