Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employees who began employment with the BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department before October 1, 1993, and who are receiving a retirement allowance from the Baltimore City Fire and Police Retirement System to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; and authorizing a surviving spouse and surviving dependent children of certain deceased retirees to participate in the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page