Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Costa, Cullison, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Luedtke, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Tarrant, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, under specified circumstances, a private entity from being qualified as a bidder for a public-private partnership; requiring an entity to certify to the reporting agency whether the entity had direct involvement in the deportation of specified victims; requiring an entity, under specified circumstances, to certify and disclose to the reporting agency specified information regarding the entity's direct involvement in the deportation of specified victims; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
(   10A-202, 10A-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page