Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Adams, Anderton, Attar, Belcastro, Buckel, Ebersole, Griffith, Jacobs, McKay, Novotny, and Thiam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources and local governing bodies to construct a communication board in each public playground by October 1, 2027; defining "communication board" as a device that displays photos, symbols, or illustrations to enable individuals with limited language skills to express themselves and communicate; and providing for the funding of communication board construction.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
(   5-2001 through 5-2003, 5-901   )
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page