Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Behavioral Health Assessments for Patients Provided Opioids - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hayes, Kipke, Morhaim, Rosenberg, Pendergrass, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration with certain entities, to study the use of certain existing behavioral health assessments to identify enrollees and insureds at risk for adverse outcomes from an appropriate course of opioids for pain management; requiring the Department, by December 15, 2018, to report its findings and recommendations regarding certain policies and procedures to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966884/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Assessments, Services, and Treatment for Patients Provided Opioids - Coverage
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {966884/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Behavioral Health Assessments for Patients Provided Opioids - Study
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page