Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Zero–Emission Energy Resources and Carbon Capture, Use, and Sequestration – Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Study
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including a zero-emission energy resource as a Tier 1 renewable source eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; and requiring the Maryland Energy Administration, in consultation with the Public Service Commission, the Department of the Environment, and the Department of Natural Resources, to conduct a study on carbon capture, use, and sequestration.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Zero–Emission Energy Resources and Carbon Capture, Use, and Sequestration – Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Study
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page