Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Lisanti, Carey, and Buckel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an Adult High School Pilot Program to establish an alternative method for adults who did not graduate from high school to earn a diploma; providing that the Program is under the authority and supervision of the State Department of Education and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, which are authorized to approve up to six pilots; requiring a pilot to be subject to the requirements of specified federal law and to provide specified accommodations; providing for a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0866
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853994/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Text - First - Adult High School Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {853994/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adult High School Pilot Program
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Adult High School Pilot Program
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text - Chapter - Adult High School Pilot Program
(   9.7-101 through 9.7-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page