Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Tarlau, Simonaire, Ebersole, Rose, Hornberger, Long, Afzali, and C. Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Encouraging public schools to post the appropriate telephone number for reporting suspected child abuse or neglect conspicuously in a high-traffic, widely used area of the school; and requiring a county board to ensure that the appropriate telephone number for reporting suspected child abuse or neglect is published in student handbooks and on the website of the county board or local school system.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Childhelp National Child Abuse Hotline - Sign
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615261/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Childhelp National Child Abuse Hotline - Sign
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {615261/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page