Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Atterbeary, Moon, and Sanchez
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from postponing a trial or hearing for a misdemeanor violation of the Maryland Vehicle Law for which the penalty is a fine not exceeding $500 if a law enforcement officer is a witness unless the law enforcement officer provides at least 1 week's advance notice of the officer's inability to attend and the court promptly notifies the person charged with the violation of the postponement.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1327 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page