Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Beidle, Carr, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Platt, Robinson, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "offshore drilling activity" to mean the exploration, development, production or transportation of oil or gas on or under the outer continental shelf; establishing that an offshore drilling activity is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a person that causes a spill of oil or gas while engaged in an offshore drilling activity is strictly liable for certain damages; providing that provisions concerning a certain bond do not apply to a judgment in a certain civil action; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {423121/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {548173/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Floor Amendment {423121/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Text - Chapter - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
(   12-301.1, 3-2101 through 3-2104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page