Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, B. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Frush, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Morgan, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, West, K. Young, Pendergrass, Hill, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Platt, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education; authorizing individuals employed by a food service facility or a recreation and wellness facility at an eligible institution to obtain, store, and administer auto-injectable epinephrine under certain circumstances; requiring an eligible institution to designate the employees who are certified to be responsible for the storage, maintenance, and control of auto-injectable epinephrine; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266682/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277377/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities at Institutions of Higher Education
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {266682/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {277377/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
(   13-7A-01 through 13-7A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page