Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Chang, Fennell, and Proctor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments to be in a form approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; prohibiting the agreement from including a confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense; prohibiting a bail bondsman from including a specified confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense in an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782610/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - First - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {782610/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {782610/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Referred Rules 63AClick to view Recorded Media
(   10-309, 27-201, 27-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page