Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Jones, Lierman, Pendergrass, Reznik, Stein, Turner, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving certain services; requiring the Commissioner to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-46)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-46) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
(   7-101, 7-205 )
(   13-101, 13-301, 13-303, 13-410, 14-202, 14-4101 through 14-4104 )
(   11-201, 11-504, 11-517, 11-602, 11-615, 12-105, 12-126, 12-405, 12-426, 12-906, 12-928, 2-104.1, 2-115, 2-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page