Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Adoption of Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain standards related to Maryland school-based health centers by August 1, 2018; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356984/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Adoption of Standards
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {356984/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Adoption of Standards
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page