Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Medical Research Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Busch
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Academic Health Center Immunotherapy Research Fund to provide matching grants to statewide academic health centers for immunotherapy research only; requiring a statewide academic health center to dedicate funding from other sources for certain purposes to qualify for a grant; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2020, to include in the budget bill an appropriation of $2,500,000 for a grant to the University of Maryland School of Medicine for immunotherapy research which does not require a matching fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - University of Maryland Medical System - Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health – Medical Research Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health – Medical Research Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health - University of Maryland Medical System - Grant
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {114564/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health – Medical Research Funding
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Text - Chapter - Health – Medical Research Funding
(   18-1101, 18-1102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page