Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a duplicative provision of law requiring a person to obtain a tidal fish license to catch certain oysters or clams for commercial purposes; altering the area within which a person is authorized to catch hard-shell clams using certain equipment from the State waters of Worcester County to the State waters of the Atlantic Ocean; prohibiting a person from catching hard-shell clams with certain equipment within 300 feet of any shore or wharf without first obtaining the permission of the shore or wharf owner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/02/2018
Legislative Date
10/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/02/2018 10/02/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {804831/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
(   4-1001, 4-1004, 4-1022, 4-1024, 4-1027, 4-1041, 4-1101, 4-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page