Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, by January 1, 2023, to establish an administrative process to approve supply offers for electricity or gas for households in the State that receive energy assistance through a program in the Office of Home Energy Programs; prohibiting, beginning on July 1, 2023, unless the Commission has approved the supply offer, a third-party retail supplier from offering to provide electricity or gas, renew a certain contract, or charge a certain fee to certain households in the State; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0397
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0685 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity and Gas – Energy Suppliers – Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997578/1
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997578/1
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {997578/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997578/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {927974/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electricity and Gas – Energy Suppliers – Supply Offers
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {997578/1 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {997578/1 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Washington) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Committee Amendment {997578/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {997578/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Substitute Committee Amendment {927974/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page