Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Tourist Area and Corridor Program in the State Highway Administration to develop a system of supplemental guide signs that direct motorists to eligible attractions within a geographical area; requiring the Administration to adopt certain regulations; providing that certain individual attractions are eligible for a sign; establishing the Task Force on Attraction Signs to review and report its findings regarding program consolidation, streamlining certain processes, and potential funding by October 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2018
Legislative Date
9/27/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2018 9/27/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs
Senate 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Reassigned to Finance 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance
(   8-605.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page