Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified provisions regarding the confidentiality of juvenile court records do not prohibit access to and confidential use of a juvenile court record by the Department of Human Resources for the purpose of claiming specified federal funds.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/20/2016
Legislative Date
10/20/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/20/2016 10/20/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page