Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State designated exchange to participate in a certain advisory committee, maintain a certain data set, and provide data under certain circumstances; authorizing the State designated exchange to use certain data to improve outcomes for patients; establishing the Maryland Commission on Health Equity to employ a health equity framework by taking a collaborative approach to improve health outcomes and reduce health inequities in the State and incorporating health consideration into broad-based decision making; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0078
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/03/2020
Legislative Date
8/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 8/03/2020 8/03/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-4201 through 13-4207, 4-302.3   )
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page