Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Higher Education Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending provisions of the Educational Excellence Fund, the Edward T. Conroy Scholarship Fund, the Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship Fund, and the Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grant Fund to require each of the funds to be special, nonlapsing funds that are administered by the Maryland Higher Education Commission, held by the State Treasurer, and accounted for by the Comptroller; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564932/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {564932/1 Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 13
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
(   15-106.7, 18-310, 18-601, 18-604, 18-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page