Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a specified coverage requirement that applies to specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations includes coverage for digital tomosynthesis, a radiologic breast cancer screening procedure, under specified circumstances; prohibiting a copayment or coinsurance requirement that is greater than for other breast cancer screenings; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0675
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0648 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2016
Legislative Date
10/12/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2016 10/12/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {887675/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
(   15-814 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page