Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Patuxent Road
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on Patuxent Road through Historic Woodwardville in Anne Arundel County, subject to certain placement and signage requirements; and requiring that the fines collected by Anne Arundel County as a result of violations enforced by certain speed monitoring systems be used to assist in covering the cost of speed reduction measures and roadway and pedestrian safety improvements on Patuxent Road through Historic Woodwardville.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Patuxent Road
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Patuxent Road
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page