Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Maryland Department of Health; renaming the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Secretary of Health; providing that the Maryland Department of Health is the successor of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing that specified names and titles of a specified unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0180
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/02/2016
Legislative Date
11/02/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/02/2016 11/02/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {777478/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
(   1-101, 2-101, 2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page