Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to be the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists; requiring that two licensed music therapists with at least 5 years' paid work experience be added to the Board; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for the practice of music therapy; authorizing the Board to facilitate the statewide dissemination of music therapy information to music therapists; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0233
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0766 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896488/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {244738/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {896488/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:02 PM
Click to return on the top page